+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary