+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.141
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.63
- Substituted For A876a
On March 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1314a
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.11
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
January 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor