+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.875
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor