+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.638
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to aging
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.116
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to aging
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Aging - May 13, 2014
- Yeas: 10
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
February 28, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Aging - Feb 28, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor