+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 1291a
- Amend and recommit to education
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to education
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Defeated in education
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of committee consideration - requested
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to education
+ − Vote
April 16, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Education - Apr 16, 2013
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 12
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: nay
- John J. Flanagan: nay
- Andrew J. Lanza: nay
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: nay
- Elizabeth Little: nay
- Carl L Marcellino: nay
- George D. Maziarz: nay
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: nay
- Joseph E. Robach: nay
- James L. Seward: nay
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: nay
- David J. Valesky: nay