+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.105
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.362
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
January 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
March 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor