+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.339
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.132
- Substituted For A5127
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.243
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor