+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.758
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1468
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (5)
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor