+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A1080b
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.491
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1218b
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1218a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Vote
February 26, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 11