+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.754
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.694
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
May 17, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor