+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.594
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.261
- Substituted For A5838
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.250
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 13
February 2, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3