+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.329
- Substituted For A5986
On February 26, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On February 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.228
- 1st Report Cal.228
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.862
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
January 23, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor