+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.651
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.556
- Substituted For A5264c
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Repassed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1184a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On January 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.65
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (6)
May 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
June 7, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 20
January 20, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 21
January 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor