+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a3303b
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 1178b
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.78
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
- Amended 1178a
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1013
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Judiciary - Jan 28, 2014
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 3
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: nay
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Kemp Hannon: nay
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: nay
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Judiciary - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 2
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: nay
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: nay
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor