+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1294
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1387
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 5, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor