+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a6618
- Ordered to third reading cal.1283
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 11, 2014
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: present
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: present
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
May 20, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Higher Education - May 20, 2014
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Higher Education - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor