+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.217
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor