+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.69
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor