+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On December 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.156
On December 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.592
- Substituted For A4017
On April 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.90
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.132
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor