+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.968
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1110a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.100
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor