+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1231
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1101a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Agriculture
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Vote
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor