+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1155
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1435
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2