+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.372
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1483
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9
June 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor