+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Defeated In Codes
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice Of Committee Consideration - Requested
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Defeated In Codes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice Of Committee Consideration - Requested
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor