+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 6, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.121
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On January 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.82
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 16, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 7
January 18, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 11
January 17, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor