+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.56
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1054a
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.210
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
June 3, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
March 4, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor