+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amend By Restoring To Original Print 1026
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1026a
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.51
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 15