+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1023a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1479
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor