+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.116
- Rules Report Cal.116
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9999a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions