+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7868a
- Rules Report Cal.340
- Reported
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9988a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Local Governments
On March 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor