+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.467
On December 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2131
- Substituted For S8968
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 9981a
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.818
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3