+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S177c
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.245
- Rules Report Cal.245
- Reported
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9970b
- Amend And Recommit To Agriculture
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9970a
- Amend And Recommit To Agriculture
On March 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor