+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S1965b
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.298
- Rules Report Cal.298
- Reported
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor