+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.283
On August 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1515
- Substituted for s7149
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.231
- Rules report cal.231
- Reported
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to housing
+ − Vote
June 18, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 18, 2014
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rules (request Of Wright)
Type:
Primary Sponsor