+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.559
On September 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1726
- Substituted For S9370
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.488
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.488
- Delivered To Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9922a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63