+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.411
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to housing
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.58
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.112
- Reported
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to housing
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor