+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On March 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Ways And Means
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.90
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor