+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S8711a
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 9883a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.581
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions