+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.145
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1578
- Substituted For S7694
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.885
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2