+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.144
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.542
- Substituted For S7734
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On March 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.707
On February 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor