+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.425
On July 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1675
- Substituted For S8736a
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.246
- Rules Report Cal.246
- Reported
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9819a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor