+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.29
- Signed Chap.319
On November 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.774
- Substituted For S4549
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.256
- Rules Report Cal.256
- Reported
On July 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On July 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor