+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.523
On August 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1713
- Substituted For S9185
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.578
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor