+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.133
On July 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- 3rd Reading Cal.1946
- Substituted For S7871
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.836
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor