+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.130
On July 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1579
- Substituted For S7224
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.712
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Vote
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor