+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.318
- Rules report cal.318
- Reported
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor