+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6884b
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.186
- Rules Report Cal.186
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9674b
- Amend And Recommit To Economic Development
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9674a
- Amend And Recommit To Economic Development
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor