+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.135
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1237
- Substituted For S7603a
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.329
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.329
- Delivered To Senate
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9640a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor