+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.249
On November 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1865
- Substituted For S6959a
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.708
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9591a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Small Business
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor