+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.116
On December 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1838
- Substituted For S8401
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.423
- Rules Report Cal.423
- Reported
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63